Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Searle, Donald, Searle, Judith, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kennedy, Esq., William Thomas, against Granby Industries, Inc., Rm Packer Co., Inc., represented by Long, Esq., Christopher G, Stewart, Esq., John B, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Mark C. Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2022 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Request for hearing
Date: May 19, 2023Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Submission of List of Documents
Date: May 19, 2023Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Notice of Filing
Date: May 19, 2023Answer to the counterclaim
Date: February 23, 2023Answer with a counterclaim
Date: February 10, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 24, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Defendant Judith Searle, Donald Searle, RM Packer CO., INC.'s Joint Motion to Amend Tracking Order By 120 Days | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to to Continue the Hearing Scheduled for July 17, 2023 (#14.0): ALLOWED 7/12/23 - Motion Allowed per G.L. c. 221, s. 62C(b), by T. George Davis, Clerk | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 07/17/2023 10:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Judith Searle, Donald Searle's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 07/17/2023 10:00 AM Motion Hearing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Request for hearing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Submission of List of Documents | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant RM Packer CO., INC.'s Notice of Filing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Compliance Applies To: Long, Esq., Christopher G (Attorney) on behalf of RM Packer CO., INC. (Defendant) | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9C Affidavit of Christopher G. Long, Esq. Applies To: Long, Esq., Christopher G (Attorney) on behalf of RM Packer CO., INC. (Defendant) | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | RM Packer CO., INC.'s Memorandum Memorandum of Law of Defendant, R.M. Packer Co., Inc., in Support of its Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.