Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hartley, James E., Hartley, Joan V., The James E. Hartley, Jr. 2020 Family Trust, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Ellsworth, Esq., Felicia H, against Burger, Allison, Chapman, Joe, Khedouri, Fred, Lorusso, Frank, Malkin, Joan, (total of 9) See All represented by Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, Rappaport, Esq., Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Douglas H. Wilkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
ORDER: of Remand
Date: April 07, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: October 19, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: of Remand | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Submission for agreement for judgment. After hearing, (#5.0): ALLOWED and approved. | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Status Review scheduled on: 04/06/2023 02:30 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding.
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 03/30/2023 15:17:02. E-mail sent with Zoom instructions to the parties of record on 3/30/23. | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Defendants James E. Hartley, Joan V. Hartley, The James E. Hartley, Jr. 2020 Family Trust, Town Of Chilmark Zoning Board Of Appeals's Submission for Agreement for Judgment | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael A Goldsmith, Esq. added for Defendant Town Of Chilmark Zoning Board Of Appeals | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ronald Rappaport, Esq. added for Defendant Town Of Chilmark Zoning Board Of Appeals | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Applies To: Ellsworth, Esq., Felicia H (Attorney) on behalf of Hartley, James E. (Plaintiff) | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 10/19/2022 | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.