Case Last Refreshed: 55 minutes ago
Kim, Margaret, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Moriarty, Esq., Robert D, Sederholm, Esq., Ernest Douglas, against Bunuel, Diego, represented by Daniels, Esq., Joshua M, Ford, Esq., Thomas J, Salomon, Esq., Nathalie K, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Mark C. Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Margaret Kim against Diego Bunuel. The complaint alleges multiple counts, including battery, assault, and intentional infliction of emotional distress. Margaret Kim, a resident of Los Angeles, California, c...
General correspondence regarding two decisions submitted by Nathalie K. Saloman
Date: April 23, 2021Plaintiff Margaret Kim's EMERGENCY Motion to Admit Attorney to Practice Pro Hac Vice
Date: April 23, 2021Opposition to paper # paper # 14 filed by Diego Bunuel
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER: Vacating Default Order Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark
Date: December 21, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: July 13, 2020Margaret Kim's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Bunuel, Diego (Defendant)
Date: November 12, 2020Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: February 23, 2022Appeal entered in Appeals Court on 02/24/2022 docket number 2022-P-0141
Date: February 28, 2022Notice of appeal filed. Applies To: Kim, Margaret (Plaintiff)
Date: October 26, 2021Plaintiff Margaret Kim's Request for Transcripts Ordered on 11/9/21
Date: November 09, 2021Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Margaret Kim, Diego Bunuel's original complaint
Date: December 21, 2023Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: March 02, 2023Notice of Entry of appeal received from the Appeals Court Notice of Rescript
Date: February 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice as to Margaret Kim, Diego Bunuel's original complaint | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Thomas J Ford, Esq., Joshua M Daniels, Esq.Diego Bunuel's Other - Memorandum in support of of Dismissal on Forum Non-Conveniens Grounds | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Status Review scheduled on: 11/16/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding Staff:Scott W Nickerson, Clerk of Courts
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:Status Review scheduled on: 11/16/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding. Comments/Notes: After hearing, additional filings due to be filed by 12/20/23.
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: This matter is stayed pending further order of the court. A Status Conference shall be held on November 16, 2023 at a time to be determined by the Clerk. | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Status Review scheduled on: 08/18/2023 11:00 AM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding Staff: Scott D Colgan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Status Review scheduled on: 08/18/2023 11:00 AM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Status Review scheduled on: 07/17/2023 10:45 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding Comments/ Notes: reschedule for August TBD.
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Continue (#39.0): ALLOWED An objection by the defendant (not his counsel) to a continuance of a court appearance (that the court gave short notice of) so as to allow a parent to go on a pre-planned vacation with his family is difficult to comprehend. Such an objection reminded me of the theme of Law Day in Rhode Island on May 5, 2023, being Cornerstones of Democracy: Civics, Civility, and Collaboration. In an article published by the American Bar Association on September 18, 2014, Jayne R. Reardon wrote: ¿The concept of civility is broad. The French and Latin etymologies of the word suggest, roughly, ¿relating to citizens.¿ In its earliest use, the term referred to exhibiting good behavior for the good of the community. The early Greeks thought civility was both a private virtue and a public necessity, which functioned to hold the state together. Some writers equate civility with respect. So, civility is a behavioral code of decency or respect that is the hallmark of living as citizens in the same state.¿ The motion is allowed. Plaintiff¿s counsel shall communicate with the court upon his return from vacation, but not before, as to a new date that works for both counsel. Honorable Mark C. Gildea, J. Applies To: Moriarty, Esq., Robert D (Attorney) on behalf of Kim, Margaret (Plaintiff); Ford, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Bunuel, Diego (Defendant); Daniels, Esq., Joshua M (Attorney) on behalf of Bunuel, Diego (Defendant) | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Margaret Kim's EMERGENCY Motion to Continue Applies To: Kim, Margaret (Plaintiff); Bunuel, Diego (Defendant); Moriarty, Esq., Robert D (Attorney) on behalf of Kim, Margaret (Plaintiff); Ford, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Bunuel, Diego (Defendant); Daniels, Esq., Joshua M (Attorney) on behalf of Bunuel, Diego (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.