Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Kenneth Michael, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Ray Rhoades, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2005 | Action |
Writ (Filed) 714320-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
July 09, 2004 | Action |
Writ of Execution 297230-Writ Issued/Money Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per |
|
June 08, 2004 | Hearing |
Court Trial 215510-Hearing: Small Claims - I/C; Michael, K vs. Rhoades, R (L) ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Michael Williams |
|
June 08, 2004 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 8 2004 Type: 223630 - SCV-Judgment: Court Manner : 212110 - Court Trial: Completed |
|
April 21, 2004 | Action |
Warrant: Issued 232110-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per |
|
April 06, 2004 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
|
January 01, 1800 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.