Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Green Hollow Llc, The Reily Family Limited Partnership, Wjh Llc, filed a(n) Zoning - Property case represented by Moriarty, Esq., Timothy Matthew, against Cisek, James, Edgartown Planning Board, Mascolo, Fred, Mccourt, Michael, Morgan, Scott, (total of 9) See All represented by Bonner, Esq., Michael S, Gillespie, Esq., Ian, Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, Rappaport, Esq., Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeZoning |
Endorsement on Motion to Transfer to Massachusetts Land Court (#7.0): ALLOWED
Date: December 11, 2019Affidavit of Timothy Matthew Moriarty, Esq. Affidavit of Service
Date: October 29, 2019Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Order of Transfer and Assignment from Chief Justice of the Trial Court, Paula M. Carey | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding General correspondence regarding Letter from Justice Paula Carey of the Trial Court RE Interdepartmental Assignment and Transfer has been Issued to the Land Court. | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Transfer to Massachusetts Land Court (#7.0): ALLOWED | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs, Defendants The Reily Family Limited Partnership, Green Hollow LLC, WJH LLC, Town of Edgartown, Edgartown Planning Board, Fred Mascolo Chairperson of Edgartown Planning Board, Lucy Morrison Member of The Edgartown Planning Board, Michael McCourt Member of Edgartown Planning Board, Scott Morgan Member of Edgartown Planning Board, Glen Searle Member of Edgartown Planning Board, James Cisek Member of Edgartown Planning Board, Thomas M. Sheehan Trustee of 32 Ocean View Avenue Realty Trust's Joint Motion to Transfer to Massachusetts Land Court | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ian Gillespie, Esq. added for Defendant Thomas M. Sheehan Trustee of 32 Ocean View Avenue Realty Trust | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael S Bonner, Esq. added for Defendant Thomas M. Sheehan Trustee of 32 Ocean View Avenue Realty Trust | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ronald Rappaport, Esq. added for Defendant Edgartown Planning Board Applies To: Fred Mascolo Chairperson of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Lucy Morrison Member of The Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Michael McCourt Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Scott Morgan Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Glen Searle Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); James Cisek Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Thomas M. Sheehan Trustee of 32 Ocean View Avenue Realty Trust (Defendant) | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Timothy Matthew Moriarty, Esq. Affidavit of Service | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Michael A Goldsmith, Esq. added for Defendant Town of Edgartown Applies To: Town of Edgartown (Defendant); Fred Mascolo Chairperson of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Lucy Morrison Member of The Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Michael McCourt Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Scott Morgan Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Glen Searle Member of Edgartown Planning Board (Defendant); Thomas M. Sheehan Trustee of 32 Ocean View Avenue Realty Trust (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.