Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cottrell, Asher, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Grady, Jr., Esq., Donald R, against Muniz Renovation Inc., represented by Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2019 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ORDER for Medical Records for Asher Cottrellfrom Martha's Vineyard Hospital
Date: October 24, 2019Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: October 24, 2019Attorney appearance On this date Donald R Grady, Jr., Esq. added for Plaintiff Asher Cottrell
Date: February 22, 2021Defendant Muniz Renovation Inc.'s Motion for Hospital Record Order of the Plaintiff
Date: October 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Matthieu J Parenteau, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn for Plaintiff Asher Cottrell | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Donald R Grady, Jr., Esq. added for Plaintiff Asher Cottrell | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Result: Status Review scheduled on: 01/13/2021 02:45 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date. | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 12/02/2020 09:21:15 Notice Sent To: Matthieu J Parenteau, Esq. Sheff Law Offices, P.C. 10 Tremont St 7th Floor, boston, MA 02108 Notice Sent To: Thomas B Farrey, III, Esq. Burns & Farrey 446 Main St 22nd Floor, Worcester, MA 01608-2302. | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 11/25/2020 12:19:02 Notice Sent To: Matthieu J Parenteau, Esq. Sheff Law Offices, P.C. 10 Tremont St 7th Floor, boston, MA 02108 Notice Sent To: Thomas B Farrey, III, Esq. Burns & Farrey 446 Main St 22nd Floor, Worcester, MA 01608-2302. | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER for Medical Records for Asher Cottrellfrom Martha's Vineyard Hospital | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. Applies To: Farrey, III, Esq., Thomas B (Attorney) on behalf of Muniz Renovation Inc. (Defendant) | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Hospital Record Order of the Plaintiff (#6.0): ALLOWED | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Farrey, III, Esq., Thomas B (Attorney) on behalf of Muniz Renovation Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.