Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Decoulos, James J., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, Town Of Aquinnah, represented by Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, Kinscherf, Esq., Kendra, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with David Ricciardone presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Defendants Town of Aquinnah, Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion to dismiss all counts
Date: October 07, 2019Defendants Town of Aquinnah, Commonwealth of Massachusetts's Motion to strike
Date: October 21, 2019Opposition to paper # 15 filed by James J. Decoulos
Date: October 21, 2019Affidavit filed by Plaintiff James J. Decoulos in support of Opposition to Motion to Strike
Date: October 21, 2019James J. Decoulos's Memorandum in support of his Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Date: October 07, 2019Rule 9A notice of filing
Date: October 21, 2019Notice of assembly of record sent to Counsel
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of appeal filed. Applies To: Decoulos, James J. (Plaintiff)
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Entry of appeal received from the Appeals Court
Date: April 27, 2020Appeal: Statement of the Case on Appeal (Cover Sheet).
Date: March 30, 2020Notice to Clerk of the Appeals Court of Assembly of Record
Date: March 30, 2020Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: October 21, 2019Opposition to paper # 7 filed by James J. Decoulos
Date: October 07, 2019Amended: amended complaint filed by James J. Decoulos
Date: August 09, 2019Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Rescript received from Appeals Court; judgment AFFIRMED in the case no. 20-P-509. Lower Court No. 1974CV00010. Memorandum and Order Pursuant to Rule 23.0 attached from Appeals Court. | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/ORDER after Rescript: The original judgment (#20.0) is Affirmed. See Memorandum and Order dated 10/30/2019 by Judge Hon. David Ricciardone. | |
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Transcript received. Motion Hearing Before The Honorable David Ricciardone, Edgartown Massachusetts Main Courtroom October 22, 2019. Contact Nancy McCann for a copy of this Transcript. | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of appeal received from the Appeals Court | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of assembly of record sent to Counsel | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal: Statement of the Case on Appeal (Cover Sheet). | |
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Clerk of the Appeals Court of Assembly of Record | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Certification/Copy of Letter of transcript ordered from Court Reporter 10/22/2019 09:30 AM Rule 12 Hearing Ordered by Plaintiff James J. Decoulos, Pro Se. | |
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of appeal filed. Applies To: Decoulos, James J. (Plaintiff) | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss all counts (#7.0): Town of Aquinnah's and Commonwealth's Motion to Dismiss. After hearing, ALLOWED see 'Memorandum of Decision and Order' this date. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.