Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ten Persons Of The Commonwealth, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Larkosh, Esq., Daniel James, Wood, Esq., Glenn A, against C. White Marine, Inc., Squibnocket Farm, Inc., represented by Shannon, Iii, Esq., Francis A, Yanofsky, Esq., Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Nickerson, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2017 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
|
Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: Ten Persons of the Commonwealth (Plaintiff)
Date: November 21, 2017ORDER: Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Judge: Nickerson, Hon. Gary A
Date: October 20, 2017Service Returned for Defendant C. White Marine, Inc.: Service made in hand;
Date: October 17, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: Ten Persons of the Commonwealth (Plaintiff) | |
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (#3.0): DENIED Judge: Nickerson, Hon. Gary A
Judge: Nickerson, Gary |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER: Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Judge: Nickerson, Hon. Gary A
Judge: Nickerson, Gary |
|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Corporate Disclosure Statement filed Applies To: Squibnocket Farm, Inc. (Defendant) | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Squibnocket Farm, Inc. | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Daniel A. Yanofsky with Exhibits | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Daniel Yanofsky, Esq. added for Defendant Squibnocket Farm, Inc. | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Lawrence G. White in opposition to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition to to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction filed by C. White Marine, Inc. | |
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Francis A Shannon, III, Esq. added for Defendant C. White Marine, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.