Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arena, Jennifer, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kelley, Esq., Paul R, against Hall, Malcolm, represented by Flanagan, Esq., William Joseph, O'Brien, Esq., Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Mark C. Gildea presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2017 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: February 24, 2021Defendant Malcolm Hall's Assented to Motion to Change Trial Date
Date: May 20, 2020Attorney appearance On this date Jessica O'Brien, Esq. added for Defendant Malcolm Hall
Date: February 24, 2021Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: April 09, 2019Received from Defendant Hall, Malcolm: Answer to original complaint;
Date: December 15, 2017Affidavit of compliance of service of process of Malcolm Hall, Paul R. Kelley, Esq.
Date: December 21, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Hall, Malcolm: Service via certified mail by Paul R Kelly
Date: December 21, 2017Original civil complaint filed with Jury Demand.
Date: October 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Jennifer Arena's original complaint Judge: Davis, T. George | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Vacate Judgment of Dismissal without Prejudice to Permit Filing of Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Motion (#29.0): ALLOWED per G.L c 221, s 62C (b), by T. George Davis, Clerk. | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Malcolm Hall's Assented to Motion to Vacate Judgment of Dismissal Without Prejudice to Permit Filing of Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to extend date of nisi dismissal (#27.0): Motion ALLOWED per G.L. c 221, S 62C (b), by T. George Davis Clerk Judge: Davis, T. George | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Jennifer Arena, Malcolm Hall's Joint Motion to extend date of nisi dismissal | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Case Settled. Request for Nisi Order Applies To: Kelley, Esq., Paul R (Attorney) on behalf of Arena, Jennifer (Plaintiff) | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 11/22/2021 Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark
Judge: Gildea, Mark |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Result: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/27/2021 09:30 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Reported Settled, 60 Day Nisi Order to Issue. | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 09/10/2021 09:00 AM Has been: Held via Video/Teleconference Hon. Mark Gildea, Presiding
Judge: Gildea, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.