Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
D'Alisera, Catherine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aiken, Esq., Steven L, against King Of Rentals Of Mv, Llc, Kirshner, Donis, represented by Gamache, Esq., Heather, Lawler, Esq., John F, Officer, Esq., David J, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts with Cornelius J. Moriarty, II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: October 27, 2017Affidavit of Steven L. Aiken
Date: October 05, 2017Received from Defendant Kirshner, Donis: Answer to original complaint;
Date: July 05, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Kirshner, Donis: Service made at last and usual;
Date: June 14, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: April 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of Dismissal: Failure to comply with nisi order. | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Steven L Aiken, Esq. Attorney: David J Officer, Esq. Attorney: John F Lawler, Esq. Attorney: Heather Gamache, Esq. | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 08/24/2018 Judge: Moriarty, II, Hon. Cornelius J
Judge: II, Cornelius JMoriarty II |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled on: 07/25/2018 10:15 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Cornelius J Moriarty, II, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Cornelius J Moriarty, II |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 07/03/2018 11:07:19 | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event on April 19, 2018 (#12.0): Trial Assignment Conference ALLOWED Trial assignment will be scheduled in July 2018 for October 2018 Trial. Judge: Kelley Brown, Hon. Angel
Judge: AngelKelley Brown |
|
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Kelley Brown, Hon. Angel The following event: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled for 04/19/2018 12:45 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Request of Defendant
Judge: Angel The following event: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled for 04/19/2018 12:45 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Request of DefendantKelley Brown |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Defendant Donis Kirshner's Assented to Motion to continue / reschedule an event 04/19/2018 12:45 PM Trial Assignment Conference | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue trial assignment conference (#11.0): ALLOWED Judge: Moriarty, II, Hon. Cornelius J
Judge: II, Cornelius JMoriarty II |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Kelley Brown, Hon. Angel The following event: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled for 02/27/2018 11:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Request of Defendant
Judge: Angel The following event: Trial Assignment Conference scheduled for 02/27/2018 11:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Request of DefendantKelley Brown |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.