Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Culik Law, P.C., filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Sweeney, Esq., Christopher Kevin, against Arruda, Michael J., represented by Larkosh, Esq., Daniel James, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Plaintiff Culik Law, P.C.'s Application of Legal Elements Comple Arbitration and Stay Litigation
Date: September 29, 2015Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i)
Date: January 30, 2017ORDER: On Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation
Date: December 01, 2015Opposition to paper #5.0 Application to Stay Arbitration filed by Culik Law, P.C.
Date: October 15, 2015Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Culik Law, P.C. (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Status Review scheduled for 02/22/2017 10:30 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Disposed | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 01/18/2017 10:46:58 | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER: On Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Arruda, Michael J.: Service accepted by counsel; Daniel J. Larkosh on 9/8/2015 | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Christopher K. Sweeney on Service | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Brief filed: Reply to Defendant's Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Application to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Applies To: Culik Law, P.C. (Plaintiff) | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Brief filed: Defendant's Supplemental Brief in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Application to Compel Arbitration, and Deendant's Application for Order to Stay Arbitration Applies To: Arruda, Michael J (Defendant) | |
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to paper #5.0 Application to Stay Arbitration filed by Culik Law, P.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.