Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prata, Wilmar A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tomassian, Jr., Esq., Martin V, against Silva, Elio, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2014 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal without prejudice | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Elio Silva(Defendant) | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Elio Silva, service made on 1/24/2014 (in hand or attorney general) | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Tracking: origin/track set, Notice sent to Plt. Atty. | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A99, Track F. | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.