Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martha'S Vineyard Savings Bank, Successor By Merger To Dukes Cou, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Twohig, Esq., Michael P, Pineau, Esq., Jane Mello, Holland, Esq., Lisa Marie, Caplan, Esq., Andrew F, against Hall, Jr., Benjamin L., represented by Hall, Jr., Esq., Benjamin L, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of docket entry received from Appeals Court Notice of Dismissal | |
May 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (P#42, Def. Motion to Determine Reasonable Attorneys Fees) DENIED (Moriarty, J.) Notices mailed 5/9/2014 | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of docket entry received from Appeals Court. Motion to Consolidate is allowed. Consolidated with DUCV2013-00011 in the Appeals Court | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Appeal entered in Appeals Court on 4/17/2014 docket #2014-P-0576 | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear on 5/9/2014 for a hearing | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Reply brief to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to have the Court Determine Reasonable Attorneys Fees filed by Defendants | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request (P#48, Request to File Reply Brief) ALLOWED (Moriarty, J.) Notices mailed 4/11/2014 | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Request to File Reply Brief | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | List of Documents | |
April 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.