Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Benjamin L. Hall,Trustee Lucky 7 Realty Trust,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hall, Jr., Esq., Benjamin L, against Cerick, Kathryn, Fitzgerald, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2012 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) Kathryn Cerick. Copies mailed 1/17/2012 | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Default (55a) as to defendant(s) Charles Fitzgerald. Copies mailed 1/17/2012 | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Kathryn Cerick by Benjamin L. Hall,Trustee Lucky 7 Realty Trust, | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Request upon clerk to default (55a) re: Charles Fitzgerald by Benjamin L. Hall,Trustee Lucky 7 Realty Trust, | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Charles Fitzgerald, service made on 12/22/2011 (last and usual) | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Kathryn Cerick, service made on 12/22/2011 (last and usual) | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Tracking: origin/track set. Notice sent to atty of record. | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A99, Track F. | |
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.