Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frederick M Condon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pinto, Jr., Esq., Donald R, against Cat Trail Properties Mv, Llc, C.B. 20, Llc, Murphy, Member, David, Case, Member, Kathleen, Zadeh, Member, Harold T, (total of 6) See All represented by Heffernan, Esq., Lawrence P, Vukota, Esq., Marilyn H, Murphy, Esq., Sean E, Goldsmith, Esq., Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Dukes County, MA, . Dukes County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2011 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDukes County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#50:Joint Motion to stay litigation until September 15,2011) ALLOWED (Smith,J) Notices mailed 2/22/2011 | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | joint MOTION to Stay Litigation | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#49:Assented to motion to continue status conference) ALLOWED (Smith,H,J.) Notices mailed 1/28/2011 | |
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Frederick M Condon's MOTION to Continue Status Conference, assented to | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#48-assented to motion of Def C.B.20,LLC to substitute party) ALLOWED (Nickerson,J) Notices mailed 1/14/2011 | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Defendant C.B. 20, LLC's MOTION to substitute Party - Assented To | |
January 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear on 2/22/2011 for a hearing | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Rescript received from Appeals Court; judgment REVERSED | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Appeal entered in Appeals Court on 3/27/2009 docket #2009-P-0641 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.