We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

In The Matter Of: Silvia, Helen G.

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago

Silvia-Degennaro, Christine, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts Bristol County Probate and Family Court with Field, Hon. Katherine A presiding.

Case Details for Silvia-Degennaro, Christine v.

Judge

Field, Hon. Katherine A

Filing Date

July 27, 2022

Category

Estates And Administration

Last Refreshed

September 30, 2023

Practice Area

Probate

Filing Location

Bristol County, MA

Matter Type

Guardianship,Conservatorship

Filing Court House

Bristol County Probate and Family Court

Parties for Silvia-Degennaro, Christine v.

Plaintiffs

Silvia-Degennaro, Christine

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Other Parties

Sabra, Esq., Steven P (Attorney)

Silvia, Helen G. (Decedent)

Silvia-Degennaro, Christine (Personal Representative)

Silvia-Degennaro, Christine (Proposed Fiduciary)

Case Documents for Silvia-Degennaro, Christine v.

Devisees

Date: July 27, 2022

Bond without Sureties

Date: July 27, 2022

Proposed Order/Decree

Date: July 27, 2022

Closing Statement

Date: September 05, 2023

Case Events for Silvia-Degennaro, Christine v.

Type Description
Docket Event Closing Statement
Docket Event Christopher Silvia Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , , Closing Statement
Docket Event Brenda Silvia-Torma Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , , Closing Statement
Docket Event Christine Silvia-DeGennaro Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , , Closing Statement
Docket Event Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 08/31/2022, by Kimberly Pedro
Docket Event Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative, August 31, 2022 Kimberly A. Pedro c/s, ltr Atty Sabra 8/31
Docket Event Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/31/2022 12:06:36
Docket Event Petition for Informal Probate
Docket Event Will dated 06/16/2021 - 3 pages
Docket Event Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
See all events