Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Camara, Brandon, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts Bristol County Probate and Family Court with McMahon, Hon. Richard J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBristol County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit In support of Motion for Special PR Applies To: Camara, Brandon (Petitioner)
Date: September 03, 2021Additional Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Inventory Filed (personal estate: $16500.00 real estate: $400,000.00)
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Claim - Antonio Almeida
Date: October 21, 2021Additional Bond Approved of Special Representative dated 09/03/2021, by Hon. Paul Cronan
Date: September 20, 2021Motion For Appointment of Special Personal Representative ALLOWED on 09/03/2021 File Reference # 5
Date: September 20, 2021Decree on Sale of Real Estate DATED 6/7/2022 Judge: Field, Hon. Katherine A
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Claim - Coastal Legal Affiliates, P.C.
Date: October 21, 2021Petition for Sale of Real Estate
Date: May 25, 2022Release of All Demands and Assent to Account by State Road Auto Sales
Date: August 03, 2022Affidavit Of FIling of Notice with the Registry of Deeds
Date: May 25, 2022Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Release of All Demands and Assent to Account Coastal Legal Affiliates, P.C.
Date: August 03, 2022Notice of Claim - DOR
Date: August 08, 2022Motion For Ex Parte Hearing ALLOWED on 09/03/2021 File Reference # 10
Date: September 20, 2021Order Appointing Special Personal Representative issued 09/03/2021 Judge: Cronan, Hon. Paul
Date: September 20, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , Assent to the PR serving w/o sureties on bond, BAC
Date: September 03, 2021Motion For exparte hearing on appointment of Special PR
Date: September 03, 2021Petition for Formal Probate
Date: September 03, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: September 03, 2021Affidavit In support of Motion to waive sureties on bond Applies To: Camara, Brandon (Petitioner)
Date: September 03, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim - DOR | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Release of All Demands and Assent to Account by State Road Auto Sales | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Release of All Demands and Assent to Account Coastal Legal Affiliates, P.C. | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Decree on Sale of Real Estate DATED 6/7/2022 Judge: Field, Hon. Katherine A | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Brandon Camara | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory Filed (personal estate: $16500.00 real estate: $400,000.00) | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition for Sale of Real Estate | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of FIling of Notice with the Registry of Deeds | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Austin Camara | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to Assent/Waive Notice to Sale of Real Estate, , by Victoria Camara |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.