Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Macrae, Kari D, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts Bristol County Probate and Family Court with McMahon, Hon. Richard J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcMahon, Hon. Richard J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBristol County Probate and Family Court |
Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: June 08, 2021Decree and Order of Formal Probate
Date: August 31, 2021Will - May 26, 2021 - 5 pages
Date: June 08, 2021Affidavit of Domicile
Date: July 13, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: June 08, 2021Petition for Formal Probate
Date: June 08, 2021Devisees
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 08/31/2021, by Stephanie Tavares MUPC Magistrate | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/31/2021 15:19:28 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in THE STANDARD TIMES. c/s KM returnable 8/20 | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Domicile | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Will - May 26, 2021 - 5 pages | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.