Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Veolia Water North America-Northeast, Llc, filed a(n) Actions Involving The State/Municipality case represented by Campbell, Esq., James M, Howe, Esq., Christopher Robert, against City Of Fall River, Inframark, Llc., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Jackie A. Cowin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2024 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
This complaint was filed in the Superior Court of Bristol. The plaintiff, Veolia Water North America-Northeast, LLC, is seeking a declaratory judgment and injunction in a public procurement bid protest against the City of Fall River. Veolia alleges t...
Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 03/26/2024
Date: March 26, 2024Proposed Filings/Orders
Date: March 26, 2024Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: March 26, 2024Exhibits/Appendix
Date: March 26, 2024Complaint electronically filed.
Date: March 26, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 04/04/2024 02:00 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie Applies To: City of Fall River (Defendant); Inframark, LLC. (Defendant) | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 04/01/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Thomas F McGuire, Jr., Presiding Staff: Kellee-Sue Milord, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV B, Court Reporter | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Summons and order of notice issued on a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction , returnable on 04/01/2024 02:00 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Short Order of Notice (#4.0): ALLOWED However, the plaintiff shall file a written motion for a PI at the hearing, so there is a motion for the Court to act upon. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Appoint Special Process Server (#3.0): ALLOWED Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 03/26/2024 | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Veolia Water North America-Northeast, LLC's Motion for Short Order of Notice. | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Proposed Filings/Orders | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Veolia Water North America-Northeast, LLC's Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.