Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
William G. Cassayre, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pro Se, against Joe Threat, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior Court of Napa - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2004 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2019 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Napa - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2004 | Hearing |
Order of Examination 213510-Hearing: Order of Exam; Cassayre, W vs. Threat, J (L) ; Judge: J21150 Snowden W. Scott Judge: W. Scott Snowden |
|
June 08, 2004 | Hearing |
Court Trial 215510-Hearing: Small Claims - I/C; Cassayre, W vs. Threat, J (L) ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Michael Williams |
|
June 08, 2004 | Action |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 8 2004 Type: 223630 - SCV-Judgment: Court Manner : 212110 - Court Trial: Completed |
|
May 19, 2004 | Action |
Warrant: Issued 232110-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per |
|
April 06, 2004 | Action |
Documents Prior to 5-17-05 DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 |
|
January 01, 1800 | Action |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.