Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jones, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lang, Esq., Ryan D, against Poitras, Shane, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Jackie A. Cowin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJackie A. Cowin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed. AMENDED Applies To: Jones, James (Plaintiff)
Date: September 10, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/31/2021
Date: August 31, 2021Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL (1-88) entered, service not completed for any party by deadline review. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Document: A Judgment of Dismissal 1-88 was generated and sent to: Plaintiff, Attorney: Ryan D Lang, Esq. Morgan and Morgan 1 State St Suite 750, Boston, MA 02109 | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. AMENDED Applies To: Jones, James (Plaintiff) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | One Trial entry of dismissal nisi S.J.C. "Order Regarding Amount in Controversy". Judge: White, Jr., Hon. William M | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/31/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ryan D Lang, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff James Jones |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.