Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Conti, Stephen, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dolan, Jr., Esq., Mark Peter, against Pappas, Alanna, represented by Gilson, Esq., George T, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Renee P. Dupuis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRenee P. Dupuis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 14, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 14, 2021Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 06/14/2021
Date: June 14, 2021Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass.Gen.Laws c. 233 s79G
Date: September 26, 2023Attorney appearance electronically filed.
Date: April 13, 2022Service Returned for Alanna Pappas; service made at last and usual
Date: August 04, 2021Plaintiff Stephen Conti's Assented to Motion to extend tracking deadline(s)
Date: April 07, 2022Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass.Gen.Laws c. 233 s79G
Date: September 26, 2023Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass. Gen. Laws c.233 S79G
Date: June 06, 2023Suggestion of death filed: Applies To: Pappas, Alanna (Defendant)
Date: September 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass.Gen.Laws c. 233 s79G | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass.Gen.Laws c. 233 s79G | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 10/02/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Comments: See (P#13) Hon. Claudine Cloutier, Presiding
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 10/10/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Claudine Cloutier, Presiding
Judge: Cloutier, Claudine |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event trial date (#13.0): ALLOWED Status Conference to be held in 60 days to determine the status of appointment of representative of defendant and trial date. Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Stephen Conti's EMERGENCY Motion to continue / reschedule an event 10/10/2023 09:00 AM Jury Trial | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Suggestion of death filed: Applies To: Pappas, Alanna (Defendant) | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Stephen Conti's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Notice of Compliance with Mass. Gen. Laws c.233 S79G | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend certain deadlines in the order after pre trial conference (#9.0): ALLOWED The deadlines in paragraphs 5 and 6 of the court's Feb. 6, 2023 order are extended by 30 days. Judge: Cowin, Hon. Jackie
Judge: Cowin, Jackie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.