Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cardona, Catherine, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Sabra, Esq., Steven P, against Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., represented by Teschemacher, Esq., Alexander C, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Sharon E. Donatelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon E. Donatelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2018 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
Service Returned for Defendant Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: September 14, 2018Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/17/2018
Date: August 17, 2018Petition/Complaint for Appointment of an Arbitrator pursuant to G.L. Chapter 251
Date: August 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation Now come the parties in the above captioned matter and hereby designate D. Robin Gouveia, Esquire as arbitrator of the plaintiff's uninsured motorist claim. Applies To: Cardona, Catherine (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. (Defendant) | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Alexander C Teschemacher, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 09/12/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Joint request of the parties Hon. Sharon Donatelle, Presiding Appeared: Staff: John Losowski, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV C, Court Reporter Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, SharonDonatelle, Sharon |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/28/2018 09:54:11 | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 08/17/2018 | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Petition/Complaint for Appointment of an Arbitrator pursuant to G.L. Chapter 251 | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Losowski, John F
Judge: John FLosowski |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Steven P Sabra, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Catherine Cardona |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.