Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Murphy, Esq., Michael J, against Mcandrews, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Sharon E. Donatelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon E. Donatelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 23, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT authorizing the foreclosure of a mortgage. Judge: Green, Hon. Karen Applies To: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christina Trust as Owner Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust (Plaintiff); Christine McAndrews Also Known As Christina A. McAndrews (Defendant)
Judge: Green, Karen |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default: 55(a) re: Foreclosure Applies To: Christine McAndrews Also Known As Christina A. McAndrews (Defendant) Judge: Green, Hon. Karen
Judge: Green, Karen |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Christine McAndrews Also Known As Christina A. McAndrews is not in the Military, an infant, incompetent | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Notice by Publication, returned SERVED (#5) Applies To: Christine McAndrews Also Known As Christina A. McAndrews (Defendant) | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure in The Sun Chronicle returnable on or before September 24, 2018. Judge: Donatelle, Hon. Sharon
Judge: Donatelle, Sharon |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Notice by Publication, returned UNSERVED (P#4) Applies To: Murphy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB doing business as Christina Trust as Owner Trustee of the Residential Credit Opportunities Trust (Plaintiff) | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit with 150 Day Right to Cure Mortgage | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 07/23/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.