Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mcglynn, Robert W., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Aspden, Esq., Matthew M, against Mcglynn, Marianne, represented by Haverty, Esq., John W, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Robert W. McGlynn's original complaint and all rights of appeal waived. | |
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding case sent to Taunton | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Marianne McGlynn Personal Representative for the Estate of Belmira Costa: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John W Haverty, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Marianne McGlynn Personal Representative for the Estate of Belmira Costa | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Marianne McGlynn Personal Representative for the Estate of Belmira Costa: Service made in hand; | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/30/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.