Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Durant, Jr., Esq., Robert J, against Angelo, Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Merita A. Hopkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Summons, returned SERVED Last and usual place of abode Applies To: Angelo, Lisa M (Defendant)
Date: February 24, 2017Counterclaim filed.
Date: January 23, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2006-WM4's original complaint and without rights of appeal. | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 07/25/2018 08:42:01 | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Frank Edward Biedak, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Lisa Marie Angelo | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Withdraw (#10.0): ALLOWED Refer to Affidavit in Support of Motion to Withdraw re: Notice and contact info to Defendant. Judge: Hopkins, Hon. Merita A
Judge: Hopkins, Merita |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Trustee for Securitized Asset Backed Receivables LLC Trust 2006-WM4 in support of Motion to Withdraw as Directed by Court | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/09/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Merita A Hopkins, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Robert J Durant, Jr., Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Frank Edward Biedak, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Jennifer A Sullivan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate 07/09/2018 02:00 PM Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter 07/09/2018 02:00 PM Judge: Hopkins, Hon. Merita A
Judge: Hopkins, MeritaHopkins, Merita A |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney Frank Edward Biedak, Esq.'s motion to withdraw as counsel of record for party Applies To: Angelo, Lisa Marie (Defendant) | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 05/11/2018 09:07:20 | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: McGuire, Jr., Hon. Thomas F The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/14/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of parties
Judge: Jr., Thomas F The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/14/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Joint request of partiesMcGuire Jr. |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue / reschedule an event (#9.0): ALLOWED Motion is allowed by agreement. Final Pre-Trial Conference shall be continued to Monday, July 9, 2018 at 2 pm. Judge: Sullivan, Jennifer A
Judge: Jennifer ASullivan |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.