Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Brodeur, Robert L., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sabra, Esq., Steven P, against Bert, Jacob, Santos, Charlene M., represented by Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Renee P. Dupuis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Stipulation of dismissal as to Robert L. Brodeur's original complaint
Date: May 14, 2018Service Returned for Defendant Bert, Jacob: Service made at last and usual;
Date: December 23, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: November 28, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Santos, Charlene M.: Service made in hand;
Date: December 23, 2016Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: March 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Dupuis, Renee P |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 07/12/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Dupuis, Renee P |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal as to Robert L. Brodeur's original complaint | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury 3/12 days scheduled for 7/23/18. Final Trial Conference 7/12/18. Case being submitted for binding arbitration on 4/20/18. | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed: | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Fregault, Garrett R The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 03/26/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Garrett R The following event: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 03/26/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as ScheduledFregault |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/20/2017 11:50:09 | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Order for Copies of Medical Records (#6.0): No Action Taken as this motion is dated May 31, 2017, and therefore does not comply with Superior Court Rule 9A. | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz (Attorney) on behalf of Bert, Jacob (Defendant) | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant Jacob Bert's Motion for Order for Copies of Medical Records from Borden Medical Center/Warren Wood, M.D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.