Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ortiz, Ernesto, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Fogaren, Sgt. Mark S., Murphy, Joseph M., represented by Conlon, Esq., Robert E, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 14, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Actions With Incarcerated Party |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Service Returned for Defendant Fogaren, Sgt. Mark S.: Service via certified mail;
Date: October 28, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Ernesto Ortiz's original complaint with each party waiving their right of appeal, if any. | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Enlarge Time to File a Responsive Pleading (#10.0): ALLOWED | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendants Joseph M. Murphy As Superintendent Of the Department of Corrections and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Sgt. Mark S Fogaren's Motion to file a response of pleading | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert E Conlon, Esq. added as Attorney for the Commonwealth for Defendant Sgt. Mark S. Fogaren | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert E Conlon, Esq. added as Attorney for the Commonwealth for Defendant Joseph M. Murphy As Superintendent Of the Department of Corrections and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Ernesto Ortiz's Notice of Service | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Serve Defendants Via First Class Mail (#8.0): DENIED | |
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Ernesto Ortiz's Motion to Serve Defendants Via First Class Mail | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Fogaren, Sgt. Mark S.: Service via certified mail; | |
October 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Joseph M. Murphy As Superintendent Of the Department of Corrections and the Commonwealth of Massachusetts: Service via certified mail; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.