Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer vs. Matthew Medeiros doing business as M J Construction et al
On February 22, 2016 a declaratory judgment g.l. c. 231a case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 22, 2016
Last Refreshed
November 26, 2023
Filing Location
Bristol County, MA
Category
Equitable Remedies
Overview
The Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer (“Town”), seeks
to enjoin commercial activity underway at residentially zoned property located at 1568 Fall
River Avenue, Seekonk, Massachusetts (the “Property”). Specifically, the Property is being used
to park commercial vehicles and store commercial equipment in a residential district without the
special permit relief required under Seekonk Zoning By-law (“ZBL”) §6.3, and the activity is
disturbing adjacent residential property occupants. The Town seeks injunctive relief requiring
Defendants Matthew Medeiros (d/b/a and a/k/a M J Construction) and Dorothy Goncalo cease all
commercial activity at the Property until the Property has the benefit of a Special Permit to allow
commercial activity at the Property under ZBL §6.3
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Judgment by Default. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED::
Date: Nov 08, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: Feb 22, 2016Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED:: | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Default Judgment (#11.0): ALLOWED by agreement. | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing for Declaratory Judgment scheduled for 11/08/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/19/2016 10:24:30 | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of service of attorney or Pro Se: Megan B. Bayer, Esq. | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Counsel in accordance with service members civil relief act | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer's Motion for default judgment pursuant to Mass.R.Civ.P. 55(b)(2) (Default Judgment attached) | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ilana M Quirk, Esq. added for Plaintiff Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Default (1-88): Defendants: Defaulted under time standards Applies To: Matthew Medeiros doing business as M J Construction (Defendant); Goncalo, Dorothy (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: on Parties Stipulated Preliminary Injunction with terms approved by this Court Applies To: Matthew Medeiros doing business as M J Construction (Defendant); Bayer, Esq., Megan B. (Attorney) on behalf of Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer (Plaintiff) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (#3.0): Other action taken After hearing from the parties, the Court approved the terms of a stipulation entered into between the parties for injunctive relief (copies provided to Atty Bayer, David Betts, and Matthew Medeiros by PfL) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED on Dorothy Goncalo on 2/24/2016 at last and usual place of abode 1568 Fall River Avenue, Seekonk MA by Bristol Deputy Sheriff Leo Johnson Applies To: Goncalo, Dorothy (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Short Order of Notice, returned SERVED on Matthew Medeiros, at last and usual place of abode, 1568 Fall River Avenue, Seekonk MA on 2/24/2016 by Bristol Deputy Sheriff Leo Johnson Applies To: Matthew Medeiros doing business as M J Construction (Defendant) | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Pro Se added as Self Represented for Defendant Matthew Medeiros doing business as M J Construction | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 03/03/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 03/02/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Request of Plaintiff | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer's Motion for Short Order of Notice | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer's Memorandum in support of Motion for a Preliminary Injunction | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 02/22/2016 | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Megan B. Bayer, Esq. added for Plaintiff Town of Seekonk, by and through its Zoning Enforcement Officer |