Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dias, Maria F, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mclean, Esq., Kathleen Horan, against Torres, Milton C, represented by Mazzocca, Esq., Richard P, Merlino, Esq., Joseph A, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Raffi N. Yessayan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaffi N. Yessayan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 22, 2016Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Maria F Dias's original complaint
Date: December 07, 2018Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: April 04, 2018Maria F Dias's Memorandum Addendum to the Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum
Date: August 24, 2018Received from Defendant Torres, Milton C: Answer and Jury Claim to Amended Complaint
Date: February 06, 2017Service Returned for Defendant Torres, Milton C: Service made at last and usual;
Date: January 12, 2017Received from Defendant Torres, Milton C: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: January 27, 2017Amended: amended complaint filed by Maria F Dias
Date: January 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed #19 Medical Records Destroyed | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Maria F Dias's original complaint | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 02/04/2019 09:00 AM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Case Settled Hon. Raffi N Yessayan, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jennifer A Sullivan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi N |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: McLean, Esq., Kathleen Horan (Attorney) on behalf of Dias, Maria F (Plaintiff) | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and/or Reference to Prior Motor Vehicle Accidents, Claims and/or Lawsuits of the Plaintiff filed by Milton C Torres | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Maria F Dias's Motion in limine to exclude Evidence and/or Reference to Prior Motor Vehicle Accidents, Claims and/or Lawsuits of Plaintiff | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 09/17/2018 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Not reached by Court Hon. Merita A Hopkins, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Jennifer A Sullivan, Assistant Clerk Magistrate Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter Digital Recording Device Bris CV B, Court Reporter
Judge: Hopkins, Merita A |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition to #21 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering Any Opinion as to Cause of Heart Palpitations and Anxiety filed by Maria F Dias | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Opposition to #22 Defendant's Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Calling Anne Marie Treadup, M.D. as Expert Witness filed by Maria F Dias | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Merlino, Esq., Joseph A (Attorney) on behalf of Torres, Milton C (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.