Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Prime Engineering, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Manning, Jr., Esq., Richard J, against 1851 Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Service Returned for Defendant 1851 Corporation: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: January 06, 2017Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: 1851 Corporation (Defendant)
Date: March 06, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) Applies To: 1851 Corporation (Defendant) | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Party status: Defendant 1851 Corporation: Voluntarily dismissed; | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant 1851 Corporation: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/16/2016 | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Richard J Manning, Jr., Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Prime Engineering, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.