Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Bomberg, Esq., Patrick Otto, Bunk, Esq., Diane M, against Medina-Velasquez, Raul, Reyes, Angel Tellez, Vale, Sandra, represented by Flanagan, Esq., William Albert, Hendrie, Esq., John, Walsh, Esq., Timothy P, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2016 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: March 21, 2018ORDER: for Forfeiture Judge: Perrino, Thomas J Applies To: Vale, Sandra (Defendant)
Date: November 28, 2018ORDER: for Forfeiture Judge: Perrino, Thomas J Applies To: Medina-Velasquez, Raul (Defendant)
Date: November 28, 2018Agreement for Judgment:
Date: November 28, 2018Defendant-Intervenor Sandra Vale's Motion to file late answer
Date: March 08, 2017Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 05, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: for Forfeiture Judge: Perrino, Thomas J Applies To: Vale, Sandra (Defendant)
Judge: Thomas J Applies To: Vale, Sandra (Defendant)Perrino Thomas J Applies To: Vale |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: for Forfeiture Judge: Perrino, Thomas J Applies To: Reyes, Angel Tellez (Defendant-Intervenor)
Judge: Thomas J Applies To: Reyes, Angel Tellez (Defendant-Intervenor)Perrino Thomas J Applies To: Reyes |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER: for Forfeiture Judge: Perrino, Thomas J Applies To: Medina-Velasquez, Raul (Defendant)
Judge: Thomas J Applies To: Medina-Velasquez, Raul (Defendant)Perrino Thomas J Applies To: Medina-Velasquez |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 11/28/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Thomas J Perrino, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Patrick Otto Bomberg, Esq., Attorney for the Commonwealth Defendant-Intervenor John Hendrie, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Garrett Fregault, Assistant Clerk Magistrate 11/28/2018 02:00 PM Digital Recording Device Bris CV A, Court Reporter Digital Recording Device Bris CV B, Court Reporter 11/28/2018 02:00 PM | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(2) Applies To: Medina-Velasquez, Raul (Defendant) | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default JUDGMENT 55(b)(2) Applies To: Vale, Sandra (Defendant) | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Commonwealth of Massachusetts's request for Default 55(a) Applies To: Vale, Sandra (Defendant) | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Diane M Bunk, Esq. added as Attorney for the Commonwealth for Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/21/2018 08:36:09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.