Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fall River Five Cents Savings Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Baker, Esq., David Matthew, against Big Mark Enterprises, Inc., Christ, Ii, George K., represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER: for Immediate Delivery of Vehicles
Date: November 06, 2015Summons on Contempt, returned SERVED Applies To: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: October 27, 2015Summons on Contempt, returned SERVED Applies To: Christ, II, George K (Defendant)
Date: October 27, 2015ORDER: on Motion to Order Defendant to Surrender Motor Vehicles
Date: September 10, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Bristol County - TAUNTON Location. | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Bristol County - NEW BEDFORD Location. | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding file sent to Taunton | |
April 27, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date. Default Judgment MRCP 55(b)2 After Hearing Moses, Hon. Richard T Judgment For: Fall River Five Cents Savings Bank doing business as Bank Five Judgment Against: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. / Christ, II, George K. Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 08/31/2015 Jdgmnt Date: 04/27/2016 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 19715.51 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 10.00 Other Costs: 87.40 Crt Ord Atty Fee: 14205.00 Judgment Total: 35,849.65 | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: for Assessment of Damages Applies To: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Christ, II, George K (Defendant) | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendants: Defaulted by 55(a) request; Applies To: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Christ, II, George K (Defendant) | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Reason: Defendant failed to appear | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 03/25/2016 10:39:34 | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Fall River Five Cents Savings Bank doing business as Bank Five's Memorandum of Damages Applies To: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Christ, II, George K (Defendant) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Fall River Five Cents Savings Bank doing business as Bank Five in support of Plaintiff's Request for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs Applies To: Big Mark Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); Christ, II, George K (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.