Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Leighton, Melissa, filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case represented by Hoffer, Esq., Robert J, against Aaa Royal Construction, Llc, New Bedford Housing Authority, R Mullen & Associates, Inc., represented by Amrhein, Esq., J. Christopher, Donnelly, Esq., Gerard T, Mayo, Esq., Courtney Elizabeth, Mcmahon, Esq., Shannon Mary, Warren, Esq., Margarita, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryActions Involving The State/Municipality |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Stipulation of dismissal as to Melissa Leighton's original complaint
Date: March 26, 20194th Party Complaint filed.
Date: August 14, 2018Received from Defendant R Mullen & Associates, Inc.: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: October 20, 20173rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: March 06, 2017Endorsement on Motion to (#5.0): File Third Party Complaint ALLOWED
Date: February 17, 2017Received from Defendant New Bedford Housing Authority: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: October 05, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal as to Melissa Leighton's original complaint | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 03/21/2019 Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J
Judge: Perrino, Thomas |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Robert J Hoffer, Esq. Attorney: Courtney Elizabeth Mayo, Esq. Attorney: Gerard T Donnelly, Esq. Attorney: James Wood, Esq. Attorney: Margarita Warren, Esq. Attorney: J. Christopher Amrhein, Esq. Attorney: Shannon Mary McMahon, Esq. | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 12/11/2018 08:50:31 | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant AAA Royal Construction, LLC: Service through person in charge / agent; | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant AAA Royal Construction, LLC: Answer to Fourth Party Complaint with claim for trial by jury; | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Shannon Mary McMahon, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant AAA Royal Construction, LLC | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | 4th Party Complaint filed. | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Leave to file Fourth Party Complaint (#14.0): ALLOWED no opposition having been lodged Judge: Dupuis, Hon. Renee P
Judge: Dupuis, Renee |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Amrhein, Esq., J. Christopher (Attorney) on behalf of R Mullen & Associates, Inc. (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.