Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Strickland, Mary, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Robenhymer, Esq., Timothy John, against Century Paving And Construction Corp, City Of Fall River, Collins Construction Company, Inc., Fall River Housing Authority, Housing Authority Risk Retention Group, Inc., (total of 8) See All represented by Broadhurst, Esq., Michelle Andrea, Egan, Esq., John, Howayeck, Esq., Gary P, Wensus, Esq., Aimee Walsh, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Merita A. Hopkins presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: October 23, 2017Plaintiff Mary Strickland's Notice of Suspension to Court, Agency, or Tribunal.
Date: June 22, 2017Received from Defendant City of Fall River: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: March 16, 2016Received from Defendant James River Insurance Company: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: February 24, 2016Service Returned for Defendant James River Insurance Company: Service made via regular mail;
Date: January 27, 2016Service Returned for Defendant City of Fall River: Service through person in charge / agent;
Date: January 27, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Mary Strickland's original complaint and waiving all rights of appeal. | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Mary Strickland's original complaint | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Hopkins, Hon. Merita A The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Hopkins, Merita A |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 05/24/2018 Judge: Hopkins, Hon. Merita A
Judge: Hopkins, Merita |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Timothy John Robenhymer, Esq. Defendant: Collins Construction Company, Inc. Attorney: Aimee Walsh Wensus, Esq. Attorney: Gary P Howayeck, Esq. Attorney: John Egan, Esq. Attorney: John Egan, Esq. Attorney: Michelle Andrea Broadhurst, Esq. | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Hopkins, Hon. Merita A The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 04/25/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Settled
Judge: Hopkins, Merita A |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Santos, Marc J The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Transferred to another session
Judge: Marc J The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 05/14/2018 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Transferred to another sessionSantos |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding file sent to Taunton | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Santos, Marc J The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 04/26/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Transferred to another session
Judge: Marc J The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 04/26/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Rescheduled Reason: Transferred to another sessionSantos |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Yessayan, Hon. Raffi N The following event: Final Trial Conference scheduled for 04/13/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: By Court prior to date
Judge: Yessayan, Raffi N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.