Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Live Well Financial, Inc., filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Billeri, Esq., Sarah A, against Campion, Scott J, Mitchell, Patricia J, The Heirs, Devisees And Legal Representatives Of The Estate Of Norman Campion, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc.
Date: May 23, 2016Received from Defendant Mitchell, Patricia J: Answer to original complaint;
Date: January 19, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Campion, Scott J: Service made at last and usual;
Date: February 23, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Mitchell, Patricia J: Service made at last and usual;
Date: February 23, 2016Received from Defendant Campion, Scott J: Answer to original complaint;
Date: February 12, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment in favor of Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc. | |
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Pleadings (#9.0): ALLOWED Upon review of the papers and the appended decision in The Massachusetts Company vs. Midura, 1995 WL 17215561 (which the Court had "Shepardized"), the motion for judgment as to the declaratory judgment on page 3 of the motion is allowed. | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Hearing for Judgment on Pleading scheduled for 05/12/2016 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled | |
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc.'s Notice of Damage Assessment Hearing | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 04/26/2016 10:25:11 | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Live Well Financial, Inc. (Plaintiff) | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment on the Pleadings | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Sarah A. Billeri, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc. | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Joseph Paul Murphy, Esq. withdrawn as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Live Well Financial, Inc. | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Campion, Scott J: Service made at last and usual; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.