Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mak, Sattia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brendemuehl, Esq., Steven P, against Chambers, Gerald V., Chambers, Paula N., represented by Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, Seliger, Esq., Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Service Returned for Defendant Chambers, Paula N.: Service made at last and usual;
Date: August 20, 2015Service Returned for Defendant Chambers, Gerald V.: Service made at last and usual;
Date: August 20, 2015Original civil complaint filed.
Date: May 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Gerald V Chambers, Paula N Chambers's original complaint and waiving all rights of appeal | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent On: 06/27/2016 09:39:04 | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#8.0) to allow Thomas B Farrey, III, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Sattia Mak (DOB 03/08/1983) from Charlton Memorial Hospital - A campus of Southcoast Hospitals Group. | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#7.0) to allow Thomas B Farrey, III, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Sattia Mak (DOB 03/08/1983) from Brockton Hospital. | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER issued on application (#6.0) to allow Thomas B Farrey, III, Esq. to inspect hospital records regarding Sattia Mak (DOB 03/08/1983) from New England Baptist Hospital. | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Gerald V Chambers, Paula N Chambers for hospital records from Charlton Memorial Hospital - A campus of Southcoast Hospitals Group, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. Applies To: Mak, Sattia (Plaintiff) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Gerald V Chambers, Paula N Chambers for hospital records from Brockton Hospital, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. Applies To: Mak, Sattia (Plaintiff) | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Application of Defendant Gerald V Chambers, Paula N Chambers for hospital records from New England Baptist Hospital, with affidavit of notice in compliance with SC rule 13. Applies To: Mak, Sattia (Plaintiff) | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Chambers, Paula N.: Service made at last and usual; | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Chambers, Gerald V and Defendant Chambers, Paula N.: Answer with claim for trial by jury; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.