We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Harborone Credit Union V Derienzo

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Harborone Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gray, Esq., Wayne M, against Derienzo, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Harborone Credit Union v. Derienzo, Anthony

Filing Date

July 23, 2012

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Last Refreshed

April 09, 2021

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Bristol County, MA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Harborone Credit Union v. Derienzo, Anthony

Plaintiffs

Harborone Credit Union

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Gray, Esq., Wayne M

Defendants

Derienzo, Anthony

Case Events for Harborone Credit Union v. Derienzo, Anthony

Type Description
Docket Event JUDGMENT of Dismissal: failure to comply with nisi order (Peter R. Krupp, Justice). Copies mailed 12/11/2013
Docket Event Case sent to Taunton
Docket Event Pre-trial ORDER on 11/4/2013
Docket Event Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 12/4/2013 (Richard T. Moses, Justice)
Docket Event Case sent to NB
Docket Event Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 11/4/2013
Docket Event SERVICE RETURNED (order of notice): Anthony Derienzo
Docket Event Agreement on the preliminary injunction on behalf of the plaintiff.
Docket Event Stipulation of partial dismissal as to Count I only.
Docket Event Motion (P#4) ALLOWED (Philip F. Leddy, Asst. Clerk/Magistrate) Notices mailed 7/23/2012
See all events