We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Taunton Federal Credit Union V Gabourel Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Taunton Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Swanson, Esq., Dina Marie, against Fonseca, Kimberly A, Gabourel, Everard, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with Robert C. Cosgrove presiding.

Case Details for Taunton Federal Credit Union v. Fonseca, Kimberly A , et al.

Judge

Robert C. Cosgrove

Filing Date

January 04, 2011

Category

Contract / Business Cases

Last Refreshed

April 09, 2021

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Bristol County, MA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for Taunton Federal Credit Union v. Fonseca, Kimberly A , et al.

Plaintiffs

Taunton Federal Credit Union

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Swanson, Esq., Dina Marie

Defendants

Fonseca, Kimberly A

Gabourel, Everard

Case Events for Taunton Federal Credit Union v. Fonseca, Kimberly A , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event Stipulation of dismissal without prejudice, without costs
Docket Event Notice sent to appear on 10/20/2011 for a hearing on Plaintiff's assessment of damages
Docket Event Notice sent to appear on 8/18/2011 for a hearing on Assessment of Damages
Docket Event Plaintiff Taunton Federal Credit Union's Amended MOTION for Assessment of Damages
Docket Event Affidavit of Michael B Lemelin
Docket Event Notice sent to appear on 6/23/2011 for a hearing on status on hearing on assessment of damages
Docket Event Hearing on (P#21 & 22) Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings/assessment of damages held, matter taken under advisement. (Robert Cosgrove, Justice)
Docket Event Notice sent to appear on 5/5/2011 for a hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Motion for Assessment of Damages.
Docket Event Notice sent to appear on 5/5/2011 for a hearing on Judgment on the Pleadings
Docket Event Atty Dina M Swanson's notice of appearance for Taunton Federal Credit Union
See all events