Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Western Oil, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mello, Esq., Kenneth S, against Lance Auto, Llc, represented by Ullucci, Esq., Andrew M., Little, Esq., Christopher H, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2007 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs to either party. | |
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 2/12/2007 (D. Lloyd Macdonald, Justice) | |
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 1/22/2007 | |
October 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 12/4/2006 | |
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#5) Allowed without opposition as to Counts I and II. (Frank M. Gaziano, Justice). Notices mailed 5/16/2006 | |
May 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Defendant Lance Auto, LLC's MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 and 2 (MRCP 12b) Complaint of Western Oil, Inc and Memorandum in Support; Affidavit of Compliance; Certificate of Service. | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Defendant Lance Auto, LLC's notice of filing Motion to Dismiss | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER: Lance Auto, LLC(Defendant) | |
March 31, 2006 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Lance Auto, LLC, service made on March 24, 2006 (agent in charge service) | |
March 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Pleading, Service by Summons, returned to Kenneth S Mello, Esq.: Court needs original summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.