Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carreiro, Deborah H., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hendrie, Esq., Daniel Sumner, against Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc., Karve, Sharad, represented by Samansky, Esq., Emily Mara, Joanis, Esq., Sean C, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2005 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs | |
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event | Atty Michael J Engelberg's withdrawal of appearance filed re: Sharad Karve, Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc. and Atty Sean C. Joanis' Notice of Appearance for Sharad Karve, Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc. | |
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance by Registrar of Motor Vehicles with proof of service on: Sharad Karve | |
September 08, 2005 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Massachusetts Registry of Motor Vehicles, service made on August 29, 2005 (agent in charge service) Becky Johnson | |
September 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Atty Edwin C Kilcline's withdrawal of appearance filed re: Sharad Karve, Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc.; Atty Michael Engelberg's Notice of appearance filed re: Sharad Karve, Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc. | |
August 16, 2005 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Sharad Karve, service made on July 26, 2005 (last and usual) | |
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc., service made on July 18, 2005 (agent in charge service) Amin Davenport | |
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event | ANSWER by Sharad Karve, Shaw Auto Leasing, Inc. to COMPLAINT (claim of trial by jury reqstd) | |
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Case selected for review pursuant to ST.1996.c358,s.5 | |
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type B03, Track F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.