Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mbna America Bank Na, filed a(n) Confirm,Vacate Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Wiener, Esq., Stephen A., against Bombardier, Jr., Robert L., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2005 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeConfirm,Vacate Arbitration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT confirming arbitrator award (Richard T. Moses, Justice). Copies mailed May 25, 2005 | |
May 24, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#3) ALLOWED It is ordered that judgment enter for plaintiff in the amount of $11,431.60 together with interest and costs (Richard T. Moses, Justice) Notices mailed May 25, 2005 | |
May 11, 2005 | Docket Event | Plaintiff MBNA America Bank NA's MOTION to confirm arbitration award; Affidavit of Compliance stating No Opposition received | |
April 05, 2005 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Robert L. Bombardier, Jr., service made on March 12, 2005 (last and usual) | |
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, case properly brought in Superior Court where seeking to compel arbitration award. (Philip F. Leddy, Asst. Clerk/Magistrate) | |
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E05, Track X. | |
March 02, 2005 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.