Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mirto, Tina M, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts Berkshire County Probate and Family Court with Simons, Hon. Richard A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBerkshire County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order 11/15/2023, Atty/Ptys ND 11/21/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Review Hearing scheduled on: 11/13/2023 11:00 AM Has been: Video Conference - Judgment/Decree/Order Issued Hon. Richard A Simons, Presiding Appeared: Petitioner Tina M Mirto Parent One Heather M Mirto
Judge: Simons, Richard A |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreement Dated 11/13/2023 Atty/Ptys ND 11/21/23 | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Schedule Order 10/06/2023, Atty/Ptys ND 10/06/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian dated September 1, 2023 Atty/Ptys ND 09/01/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order 09/01/2023, Atty/Ptys ND 09/08/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Disclose dated September 1, 2023 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Docketing Error | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Segregated report of the Probation Department dated 9/18/23 | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 09/06/2023 12:51:22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.