Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Parrott, Jennifer L, Parrott, Ray L, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts Berkshire County Probate and Family Court with Simons, Hon. Richard A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship Managed |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBerkshire County Probate and Family Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Extending the Appointment of Temporary Guardian dated November 14, 2023 Atty/Pts ND 12/05/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 11/28/2023 11:24:41 | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Notice and Order Sent Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A Event: Pretrial Conference - Probate and Guardianship Date: 02/20/2024 Time: 09:00 AM
Judge: Simons, Richard A |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Resulted: Review Hearing scheduled on: 11/13/2023 11:00 AM Has been: Video Conference - Judgment/Decree/Order Issued Hon. Richard A Simons, Presiding Appeared: Petitioner Jennifer L Parrott Petitioner Ray L Parrott Biological Father Daniel C Sumner
Judge: Simons, Richard A |
|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order 10/06/2023, Atty/Ptys ND 10/06/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Bond Approved of Guardian dated 09/08/2023, by Clement A Ferris Judge: Ferris, Clement A | |
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Temporary Guardian of a Minor Entered 09/01/23 NTC ATTY/PTYS 9/8/23 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority (Guardianship of a Minor) Sent On: 09/06/2023 12:11:51 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Agreement Dated 09/01/2023 of Parties on Petitions for G'ship #1 filed 7/20/2023 NTC ATTY/PTYS 09/08/23 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance of Daniel C Sumner, Pro Se |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.