Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abderhalden, Jr., Edward C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts Berkshire County Probate and Family Court with Simons, Hon. Richard A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2023 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBerkshire County Probate and Family Court |
Proposed Order/Decree
Date: July 17, 2023Petition for Informal Probate Attorney: Smith, Esq., Benjamin
Date: July 17, 2023Bond without Sureties
Date: July 17, 2023Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate
Date: July 17, 2023Will dated 5/28/2004 [original received on 9/14/2023]
Date: July 17, 2023Devisees
Date: July 17, 2023Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: July 17, 2023Affidavit as to Military Service Attorney: Smith, Esq., Benjamin
Date: July 17, 2023Notice of Claim: Commonwealth of Massachusetts Estate Recovery Unit
Date: September 25, 2023Affidavit Of Roscoe Sandlin
Date: September 05, 2023Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/20/2023, by Megan J. Tesoniero, Esq.
Date: September 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Claim: Commonwealth of Massachusetts Estate Recovery Unit | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Informal Probate of Will and/or Appointment of Personal Representative dated September 20, 2023 Atty/Ptys ND 09/21/23 Judge: Tesoniero, Esq., Megan J. | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 09/20/2023, by Megan J. Tesoniero, Esq. | |
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 09/21/2023 10:18:19 | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Roscoe Sandlin | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order/Decree | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Informal Probate Attorney: Smith, Esq., Benjamin | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Bond without Sureties | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Return of Service on Notice of Informal Probate | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Will dated 5/28/2004 [original received on 9/14/2023] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.