Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martin, Susan R., Ryan, Paul T., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts Berkshire County Probate and Family Court with Simons, Hon. Richard A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2023 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBerkshire County Probate and Family Court |
Will dated 6/3/2005 [original received on 7/17/2023]
Date: July 14, 2023Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: July 14, 2023Bond without Sureties
Date: July 14, 2023Petition for Formal Probate Attorney: Martin, Esq., Michael J
Date: July 14, 2023Devisees
Date: July 14, 2023Proposed Order/Decree
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 08/23/2023 15:03:19 | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate dated August 22, 2023 Atty/Ptys ND 08/23/23 Judge: Tesoniero, Esq., Megan J. | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 08/22/2023, by Megan J. Tesoniero, Esq. Judge: Tesoniero, Esq., Megan J. | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered Attorney: Martin, Esq., Michael J | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE: Citation on Petition for Formal Adjudication issued for unsupervised administration to be published in the Berkshire Eagle, Pittsfield. | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Will dated 6/3/2005 [original received on 7/17/2023] | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Bond without Sureties | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Formal Probate Attorney: Martin, Esq., Michael J | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Devisees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.