Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kilmer, Josephine C, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts Berkshire County Probate and Family Court with Simons, Hon. Richard A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSimons, Hon. Richard A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBerkshire County Probate and Family Court |
Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law
Date: June 14, 2021Affidavit as to Military Service
Date: June 14, 2021Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Personal Representative | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Special Representative dated 07/07/2021, by Clement A Ferris Judge: Ferris, Clement A | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Special Pers. Rep. Sent On: 07/07/2021 09:38:43 | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Personal Representative dated June 24, 2021 Att/Ptys ND 06/28/21 Judge: Simons, Hon. Richard A | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Surviving Spouse, Children, Heirs at Law | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit as to Military Service | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Without Sureties Filed | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Special Personal Representative Applies To: Cimini, Esq., Albert J (Attorney) on behalf of Kilmer, Josephine C (Proposed Fiduciary) | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Death |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.