Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brown, Jeffrey, Brown, Theodore, Harpin, Debora, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Kinne, Esq., Kevin M, Rivkin, Esq., Michael A, against Heiney, Jonathan Garry, Spidercuff Usa, Llc, Spidercuff Usa Llc, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
This complaint, filed by Theodore Brown, Jeffrey Brown, and Debora Harpin against Spidercuff USA, LLC and Jonathan Garry Heiney, alleges violations of non-payment of wages under G.L. c. 149 § 148 and common law claims. The plaintiffs, who worked in d...
Complaint electronically filed.
Date: November 20, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: November 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Clerk's Notice on Endorsement on Request for Plaintiff's request for extension of 30 days to respond to the complaint that was mailed to Jonathan Heiney at the 99 Hawthorne Avenue, Pittsfield address was returned to Clerk's Office marked return to sender not deliverable as addressed unable to forward. | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Request for Plaintiff's request for extension of 30 days to respond to the complaint, FILED. (#5.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Heiney, Jonathan Garry (Defendant); Pro Se (Attorney) on behalf of Heiney, Jonathan Garry (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Spidercuff USA LLC, Jonathan Garry Heiney's Request for extension of 30 days to respond to the complaint, RECEIVED. Applies To: Heiney, Jonathan Garry (Defendant); Pro Se (Attorney) on behalf of Heiney, Jonathan Garry (Defendant) | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added for Defendant Jonathan Garry Heiney | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Heiney, Jonathan Garry: Service made in hand; to Jonathan Garry Heiney at 99 Hawthorne Ave Pittsfield, Ma 01201 on 12/7/2023 at 11:43 am. FILED Applies To: Heiney, Jonathan Garry (Defendant) | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Spidercuff USA, LLC on 12/7/2023 at 11:43 am a true and attested copy of the Summons & Complaint by delivering in hand to Spidercuff USA, LLC/c/o Jonathan Garry Heiney, Registered Agent at 99 Hawthorne Ave Pittsfield, MA 01201. FILED Applies To: Spidercuff USA LLC (Defendant) | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: on this date 2 blank summons mailed to Attys Kinne and Rivkin, Cohen Kinne Valicenti & Cook | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. Applies To: Brown, Theodore (Plaintiff); Brown, Jeffrey (Plaintiff); Harpin, Debora (Plaintiff); Kinne, Esq., Kevin M (Attorney) on behalf of Brown, Jeffrey, Brown, Theodore, Harpin, Debora (Plaintiff); Rivkin, Esq., Michael A (Attorney) on behalf of Brown, Jeffrey, Brown, Theodore, Harpin, Debora (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.