Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Duffy, Michael, Mcateer, Matthew, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Horan, Esq., Brian T, against Barnard, Matthew, Berkshire Houseworks Llc, represented by Mccarthy, Esq., Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Francis E. Flannery presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
|
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 16, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: June 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: NOTICE TO APPEAR for hearing on Arbitrator's Award on 1/23/2024 at 2:00 PM by zoom Applies To: McCarthy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Houseworks LLC (Defendant); Horan, Esq., Brian T (Attorney) on behalf of McAteer, Matthew (Plaintiff) | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 10/26/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held via video/phone-counsel report case is going to Arbitration on 11/30 & 12/4 if needed; case scheduled for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, on 1/23/24 at 2:00 PM if necessary (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Applies To: McCarthy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Houseworks LLC (Defendant); Horan, Esq., Brian T (Attorney) on behalf of McAteer, Matthew (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing scheduled on: 10/26/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: Hearing scheduled in error Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order for Approval of Plaintiff(s) Matthew McAteer, Michael Duffy's Motion (#3.0) for a Real Estate Attachment as to Defendant Matthew Barnard in the amount of $60,000.00. entered (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: McAteer, Matthew (Plaintiff); Duffy, Michael (Plaintiff); Barnard, Matthew (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER: on plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Arbitration and for Attachment of Real Property entered (Agostini, J.) Copies certified to counsel Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: McCarthy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Houseworks LLC (Defendant); Horan, Esq., Brian T (Attorney) on behalf of McAteer, Matthew (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Matter taken under advisement: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 07/11/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Matthew Barnard FILED with Exhibit A copy - *Original to be filed on 7/11/2023 Applies To: Barnard, Matthew (Defendant) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit. Supplemental Affidavit of Brian T. Horan. FILED Applies To: Horan, Esq., Brian T (Attorney) on behalf of McAteer, Matthew (Plaintiff) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Barnard, Matthew: Answer to original complaint; with Certificate of Service, FILED Applies To: Barnard, Matthew (Defendant); McCarthy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Barnard, Matthew (Defendant) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to to Motion for Attachment filed by Matthew Barnard, Berkshire Houseworks LLC with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: McCarthy, Esq., Michael J (Attorney) on behalf of Barnard, Matthew, Berkshire Houseworks LLC (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.