Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wood, Jason, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Burke, Esq., Timothy Michael, against City Of North Adams, Macksey, In Her Official And Individual Capacity, Jennifer A, represented by Dupere, Esq., Adam, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: May 05, 2023Complaint electronically filed.
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Jason Wood, Jennifer A Macksey, IN Her Official And Individual Capacity, City Of North Adams's original complaint FILED Applies To: Wood, Jason (Plaintiff); Burke, Esq., Timothy Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Wood, Jason (Plaintiff); Dupere, Esq., Adam (Attorney) on behalf of City Of North Adams, Macksey, IN Her Official And Individual Capacity, Jennifer A (Defendant); Burke, Esq., Jared (Attorney) on behalf of Wood, Jason (Plaintiff) | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant, City of North Adams Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint. FILED Applies To: Dupere, Esq., Adam (Attorney) on behalf of Macksey, IN Her Official And Individual Capacity, Jennifer A (Defendant) | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned for copy of Summonses, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet and Tracking Order in the following manner: by delivering via email to Attorney Adam Dupere, Counsel for the defendant's. FILED Defendant Macksey, IN Her Official And Individual Capacity, Jennifer A: Service accepted by counsel; | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Adam Dupere, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant City Of North Adams | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Adam Dupere, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Jennifer A Macksey, IN Her Official And Individual Capacity | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 05/08/2023 | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.